Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanley Roman

Bishop Emeritus of Quilon, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1941 Born
16 Dec 196625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Quilon, India
16 Oct 200160.3AppointedBishop of Quilon, India
16 Dec 200160.5Ordained BishopBishop of Quilon, India
18 Apr 201876.8RetiredBishop of Quilon, India

MicroData Summary for Stanley Roman
Bishop Stanley Roman (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Quilon

EventPlace
Birth PlacePunalur
Ordained BishopGrounds, St. Aloysius School, Kollam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quilon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,089
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 18 Apr 2018