Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Trivandrum

Archidioecesis Trivandrensis Latinorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 June 2004
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 686 (264 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.latinarchdiocesetrivandrum.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Vellayambalam, Thiruvananthapuram-695003, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0471)2724.001
  • Fax: 2725.001

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Trivandrum
1 July 1937ErectedDiocese of Quilon Diocese of Trivandrum (erected)
14 June 1996Territory LostDiocese of Trivandrum Diocese of Neyyattinkara (erected)
Archdiocese of Trivandrum
3 June 2004ElevatedDiocese of Trivandrum Archdiocese of Trivandrum

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Trivandrum
1950124,3851,036,65912.0%3014442,8262685153ap1951
1969325,0002,251,27314.4%87321192,7317726073ap1971
1980375,2502,358,80015.9%95531482,53595548101ap1981
1990400,0002,752,00014.5%102601622,469105565109ap1991
1999203,2621,784,86711.4%82801621,25412352064ap2000
2000207,2621,882,86711.0%83881711,21212654065ap2001
2001218,2122,037,81710.7%84871711,27613257065ap2002
2002219,2122,040,31710.7%83961791,22415164665ap2003
2003231,2441,852,48212.5%87881751,32112767068ap2004
Archdiocese of Trivandrum
2004236,8941,857,11212.8%92791711,38512352068ap2005
2010244,4882,251,80010.9%1091022111,15828568078ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 22 Aug 2012