Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Victor Dereere, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trivandrum

Titular Bishop of Ibora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1880BornOstende, Belgium
17 Jun 190525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
10 Feb 193656.0AppointedBishop of Quilon, India
17 May 193656.3Ordained BishopBishop of Quilon, India
1 Jul 193757.4AppointedBishop of Trivandrum, India
24 Oct 196686.7RetiredBishop of Trivandrum, India
24 Oct 196686.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ibora
31 Dec 197393.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Trivandrum, India

MicroData Summary for Vincent Victor Dereere:
Bishop Vincent Victor Dereere O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trivandrum

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1936, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013