Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Bernard Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Trivandrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1917BornMurukumpuzha
25 Mar 194426.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 195537.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum, India
5 May 195537.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
24 Aug 195538.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
4 Jul 196144.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trivandrum, India
1 Oct 196649.2SucceededBishop of Trivandrum, India
13 Jun 197860.9DiedBishop of Trivandrum, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Bernard Pereira:
Bishop Peter Bernard Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of Trivandrum

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 66
  • ab/coad: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1961, Page 732
  • ab/coad: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962, Page 668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015