Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Ambrose Abasolo y Lecue, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1904BornAmorebieta, Spain
24 Sep 192723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
25 Dec 194945.3AppointedBishop of Vijayapuram, India
11 Jun 195045.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vijayapuram, India
16 Jan 197166.3ResignedBishop of Vijayapuram, India
10 Jan 198277.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram, India

MicroData Summary for John Ambrose Abasolo y Lecue:
Bishop John Ambrose Abasolo y Lecue O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013