Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict Jacob Acharuparambil, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trivandrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1919BornPalliport
17 Mar 194525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Aug 197960.2AppointedBishop of Trivandrum, India
7 Oct 197960.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trivandrum, India
31 Jan 199171.7ResignedBishop of Trivandrum, India
13 Aug 199576.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Trivandrum, India

MicroData Summary for Benedict Jacob Acharuparambil
Bishop Benedict Jacob Acharuparambil O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trivandrum

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Dec 2016