Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Verapoly

Archidioecesis Verapolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francis Kallarakal, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 1,500 (579 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://verapoly.in/
  • Mailing Address: Latin Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 2581, Kochi-682031, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0484)2372.892
  • Fax: 2360.911

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Malabar
1659ErectedDiocese of Cochin Vicariate Apostolic of Malabar (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Verapoly
1709Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Malabar Vicariate Apostolic of Verapoly
1838Territory AddedArchdiocese of Cranganore (Angamala) (suppressed) Vicariate Apostolic of Verapoly
Archdiocese of Verapoly
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Verapoly Archdiocese of Verapoly
14 July 1930Territory LostArchdiocese of Verapoly Diocese of Vijayapuram (erected)
3 July 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Verapoly Diocese of Kottapuram (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Verapoly
1950129,7161,591,5348.2%89521419198728645ap1951
1970648,4322,500,00025.9%108751833,54311355953ap1971
1980252,9444,488,0005.6%116781941,30320273669ap1981
199024,7542,293,5751.1%10664170145148721102ap1991
1999252,5582,490,14510.1%185118303833268882132ap2000
2000266,0602,539,94810.5%192133325818259900134ap2001
2001256,3532,590,7479.9%192134326786340923139ap2002
2002262,2842,642,5629.9%212144356736361923142ap2003
2003269,5932,695,41310.0%204147351768463951143ap2004
2004269,9462,749,3219.8%208147355760469950143ap2005
2010315,7673,193,0969.9%1571693269684911,075158ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Aug 2014