Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Assisi Chullikatt

Apostolic Nuncio to Kazakhstan

Titular Archbishop of Ostra

Apostolic Nuncio to Kyrgyzstan

Apostolic Nuncio to Tadjikistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1953 BornBolghatty
3 Jun 197825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Verapoly, India
29 Apr 200653.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ostra
29 Apr 200653.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jordan
29 Apr 200653.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iraq
25 Jun 200653.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ostra
17 Jul 201057.3AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations
1 Jul 201461.2ResignedPermanent Observer to United Nations
30 Apr 201663.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kazakhstan
30 Apr 201663.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tadjikistan
24 Jun 201663.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kyrgyzstan

MicroData Summary for Francis Assisi Chullikatt
Archbishop Francis Assisi Chullikatt (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Kazakhstan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Kazakhstan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,176
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2010
  • r: CB, 1 Jul 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jun 2016