Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bashar Matti Warda, C.SS.R.

Archbishop of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1969 BornBaghdad
8 May 199323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Aug 199728.2ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Sep 200132.3Professed (Perpetual Vows)Priest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 May 200939.9SelectedArchbishop of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean), Iraq
24 May 201040.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Jul 201041.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Bashar Matti Warda:
Archbishop Bashar Matti Warda C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop of Arbil {Erbil}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013