Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis RaphaŽl I Cardinal Sako

Patriarch of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq

Archbishop of Baghdad (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1949 Born
1 Jun 197424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Oct 200253.3SelectedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Sep 200354.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
14 Nov 200354.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
2010¹60.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sulaimaniya (Chaldean), Iraq
2013¹63.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Sulaimaniya (Chaldean), Iraq
31 Jan 201363.5SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
31 Jan 201363.5SelectedArchbishop of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
1 Feb 201363.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
1 Feb 201363.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
28 Jun 201868.9Elevated to Cardinal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis RaphaŽl I Sako
(VIAF: 310529360; WikiData: Q3986360)
Louis RaphaŽl I Cardinal Sako (born ) Patriarch of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZākhō, Diocese of Zaku (Chaldean)
Ordained BishopSaint Hormizda of the Antonin Monks, Monastery, Mossul, Archeparchy of Mossul-Aqrā (Chaldean)

Please contact the Cardinal through the Patriarchate of Baghdad (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,481
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2013
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2023, Page 87*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 11 Nov 2023