Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basel Salim Yaldo

Curial Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)

Titular Bishop of Bethzabda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1970 BornTelkaif, Iraq
23 Nov 200232.5Ordained PriestPriest of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
2007²36.6IncardinatedPriest of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean), USA
27 Jun 2014³44.0SelectedCurial Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Jan 201544.6ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Jan 201544.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethzabda
6 Feb 201544.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethzabda

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basel Salim Yaldo:
Bishop Basel Salim Yaldo (born ) Curial Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2015
  • ob/c12: CB, 15 Jan 2015
  • c34: CB, 6 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015