Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ibrahim Namo Ibrahim

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1937 BornTelkaif, Iraq
30 Dec 196225.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 198244.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Chaldean)
11 Jan 198244.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Anbar dei Caldei
7 Mar 198244.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anbar dei Caldei
3 Aug 198547.8AppointedBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean), USA
3 May 201476.6RetiredBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean), USA

MicroData Summary for Ibrahim Namo Ibrahim:
Bishop Ibrahim Namo Ibrahim (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,403
  • r: Bollettino, 3 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jun 2014