Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Emmanuel III (Emmanuel-Karim) Cardinal Delly

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1927BornTelkaif
21 Dec 195225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
7 Dec 196235.1SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
7 Dec 196235.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
26 Dec 196235.2ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
19 Apr 196335.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
6 May 196739.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Kaskar dei Caldie
199769.2AppointedCurial Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Oct 200275.0RetiredCurial Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Dec 200376.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Dec 200376.1SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Dec 200376.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Dec 200376.1SelectedArchbishop of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Nov 200780.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 201285.2RetiredPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
19 Dec 201285.2RetiredArchbishop of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
8 Apr 201486.5DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel III (Emmanuel-Karim) Delly:
Emmanuel III (Emmanuel-Karim) Cardinal Delly (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Babylon {Babilonia}

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.9 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,386
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2012
  • d: CB, 9 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015