Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Athanase Jean Daniel Bakose

Deceased

Archbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1898Born
18 Dec 192123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
2 Dec 195355.3AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
7 Feb 195455.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
12 Jan 198384.4DiedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Athanase Jean Daniel Bakose
Archbishop Athanase Jean Daniel Bakose (born , died ) Archbishop of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagdad

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018