Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clément Ignace Mansourati

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Titular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1917BornMardin
28 Jan 194022.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 196345.3SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
6 Jul 196345.5ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
6 Jul 196345.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria dei Siri
15 Aug 196345.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria dei Siri
11 Aug 198264.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Clément Ignace Mansourati:
Archbishop Clément Ignace Mansourati (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013