Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques Michel Djarwé

Deceased

Archbishop of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1914BornMardin
20 Feb 193823.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 196753.1AppointedArchbishop of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian), Syria
20 Aug 196753.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian), Syria
8 Sep 198167.2DiedArchbishop of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Jacques Michel Djarwé:
Archbishop Jacques Michel Djarwé (born , died ) Archbishop of Hassaké-Nisibi

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015