Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denys Philippe Beilouné

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1910BornAlep
18 Dec 193222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
19 Aug 196858.3AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
12 Jan 196958.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
22 Dec 199080.6DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Denys Philippe Beilouné:
Archbishop Denys Philippe Beilouné (born , died ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013