Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timoteo Hikmat Beylouni

Apostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Syrian)

Titular Bishop of Sabrata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1945 BornAleppo, Syria
26 Nov 197227.0Ordained PriestPriest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
1 Mar 201165.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Syrian)
1 Mar 201165.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sabrata
22 May 201165.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sabrata

MicroData Summary for Timoteo Hikmat Beylouni:
Bishop Timoteo Hikmat Beylouni (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Venezuela (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,062

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013