Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Joseph III (Ephrem) Younan

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1944 BornHassaké
12 Sep 197126.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 199551.0AppointedBishop of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian), USA
7 Jan 199651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian), USA
20 Jan 200964.2SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
20 Jan 200964.2SelectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
22 Jan 200964.2ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
22 Jan 200964.2ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
15 Feb 200964.3InstalledPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace Joseph III (Ephrem) Younan:
Patriarch Ignace Joseph III (Ephrem) Younan (born ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,656

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013