Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rami Flaviano Al-Kabalan

Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

Titular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri

Titular See: (Western Europe/Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1979 Born
16 Jul 200525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
21 Jun 201737.9AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
28 Mar 202040.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
13 Sep 202041.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri

MicroData Summary for Rami Flaviano Al-Kabalan
Bishop Rami Flaviano Al-Kabalan (born ) Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaidal
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 Sep 2020
  • c34: CB, 13 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast