Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Antoine (Jules) Samhiri

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1801Born
15 Aug 182220.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jan 182624.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mardin (Syrian), Turkey
30 Apr 182725.4Converted
30 Nov 185352.0AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
30 Nov 185352.0AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
8 Dec 185352.0InstalledPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
7 Apr 185452.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
7 Apr 185452.4ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
16 Jun 186462.6DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace Antoine (Jules) Samhiri (VIAF: 285661768)
Patriarch Ignace Antoine (Jules) Samhiri (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossoul

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 109
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 50
  • ob: CB, 15 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017