Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cirillo Benham Benni

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1831Born
8 Mar 185624.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Mar 185624.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 186230.5AppointedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
9 Mar 186230.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
18 May 189462.7AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
18 May 189462.7AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
13 Sep 189766.0DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Cirillo Benham Benni (VIAF: 44697672)
Patriarch Cirillo Benham Benni (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
Ordained BishopMardin

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 109
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017