Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Athanase Ignace Nuri

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1857Born
11 Mar 189436.2AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
16 Jun 189537.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
1908²50.0ResignedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
1908²50.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Siri
9 Nov 194688.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Athanase Ignace Nuri
Archbishop Athanase Ignace Nuri (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMardin

  • a bishop for 51.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jun 2017