Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace George Chelhot (Scelhot)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1818Born
2 Feb 184324.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 186243.3AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
25 May 186243.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
21 Dec 187456.2AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
21 Dec 187456.2AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
8 Dec 189173.2DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace George Chelhot (Scelhot)
Patriarch Ignace George Chelhot (Scelhot) (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo
Ordained BishopMardin, Archdiocese of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017