Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Sciasciatian (Chachatia)

Deceased

Bishop of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1807Born
2 May 185548.3AppointedBishop of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey
10 Jun 185548.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey
1 Dec 186356.9DiedBishop of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Sciasciatian (Chachatia)
Bishop Gabriele Sciasciatian (Chachatia) (born 1807, died ) Bishop of Mardin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017