Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Grégoire II Pierre VI Djeranian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jun 1812SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
19 Dec 1814ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
22 Sep 1840DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Grégoire II Pierre VI Djeranian
Patriarch Grégoire II Pierre VI Djeranian (died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast