Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kapriel (Gabriel) Khoudeyd (Hadid)

Deceased

Bishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1772Born
3 Feb 181340.7AppointedBishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria
5 May 181340.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria
10 Jan 182350.6DiedBishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Kapriel (Gabriel) Khoudeyd (Hadid)
Bishop Kapriel (Gabriel) Khoudeyd (Hadid) (born , died ) Bishop of Alep

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 1 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,714

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018