Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Gregory Petros VIII (Michael) Der-Asduazadrian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1843SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
25 Jan 1844ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
9 Jan 1866DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Gregory Petros VIII (Michael) Der-Asduazadrian
Patriarch Gregory Petros VIII (Michael) Der-Asduazadrian (died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Mar 2017