Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Hagian

Deceased

Bishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1803BornPerkenik
1850¹46.5AppointedBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey
2 Jun 185047.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey
8 May 188076.9DiedBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Hagian
Bishop Giovanni Hagian (born , died ) Bishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016