Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grégoire (Krikor) Balitian

Deceased

Bishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1815Born
30 Jul 184327.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 186145.0AppointedBishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria
2 Feb 186145.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria
26 Dec 189781.9DiedBishop of Alep (Armenian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Grégoire (Krikor) Balitian
Bishop Grégoire (Krikor) Balitian (born , died ) Bishop of Alep

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017