Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Arakelian

Deceased

Bishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1806Born
14 Aug 187771.2AppointedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
23 Sep 187771.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
1890¹83.6DiedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Arakelian
Bishop Carlo Arakelian (born , died 1890) Bishop of Ancira (Angora)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncira
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, Constantinople

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,886
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,877, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast