Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Boghos Bédros (Paul Peter) XI Emmanuélian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1829Born
26 Aug 188152.6AppointedBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey
30 Oct 188152.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey
26 Jul 189970.5SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
14 Dec 189970.9ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
18 Apr 190475.2DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Boghos Bédros (Paul Peter) XI Emmanuélian (VIAF: 24001733)
Patriarch Boghos Bédros (Paul Peter) XI Emmanuélian (born , died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTelerpen, Turkey

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 167, and Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017