Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément Ghazarossian

Deceased

Bishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1830Born
28 Aug 190171.6SelectedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
9 Sep 190171.6ConfirmedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
21 Nov 190171.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
21 Nov 191080.8DiedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Clément Ghazarossian
Bishop Clément Ghazarossian (born , died ) Bishop of Ancira (Angora)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnkara

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast