Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Boghos Bédros (Pierre Paul) XII Sabbaghian

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1836BornAlep
1857¹20.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 190165.5SelectedBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
15 Nov 190165.8ConfirmedBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
21 Nov 190165.8Ordained BishopBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
4 Aug 190468.5SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
14 Nov 190468.8ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
Apr 1910³74.1ResignedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
Aug 1915³79.5DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Boghos Bédros (Pierre Paul) XII Sabbaghian:
Patriarch Boghos Bédros (Pierre Paul) XII Sabbaghian (born ) Patriarch Emeritus of Cilicia

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 88
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013