Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Léon Kecegian [Ketchedjian]

Deceased

Archbishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (and Tokat {Toqat}) (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1860BornMarasc
28 May 188827.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 190746.9SelectedArchbishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (and Tokat {Toqat}) (Armenian), Turkey
20 May 190847.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (and Tokat {Toqat}) (Armenian), Turkey
21 Jun 190847.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (and Tokat {Toqat}) (Armenian), Turkey
May 1916³55.7DiedArchbishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (and Tokat {Toqat}) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léon Kecegian [Ketchedjian]:
Archbishop Léon Kecegian [Ketchedjian] (born ) Archbishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (and Tokat {Toqat})

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013