Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Kaciadurian

Deceased

Bishop of Melitene (Malatia) (Armenian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1845Born
6 Feb 189953.9AppointedBishop of Melitene (Malatia) (Armenian), Syria
14 May 189954.2Ordained BishopBishop of Melitene (Malatia) (Armenian), Syria
Aug 1915²70.4DiedBishop of Melitene (Malatia) (Armenian), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Kaciadurian
Bishop Michel Kaciadurian (born , died Aug 1915) Bishop of Melitene (Malatia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMezré
Ordained BishopIstanbul

  • a bishop for 16.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 378
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018