Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Placido Kasangian

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Selymbria

Titular See: (Antioch/Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1828Born
14 Sep 186435.9AppointedArchbishop
21 Nov 186436.0Ordained BishopArchbishop
26 Aug 188152.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
1883¹54.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Placido Kasangian
Archbishop Jean Placido Kasangian (born , died 1883) Titular Archbishop of Selymbria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 512
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017