Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Tilkian

Deceased

Bishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1809Born
1833¹23.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 185344.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian), Iran
17 Sep 185849.5AppointedBishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey
31 Oct 185849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey
4 Jun 188576.2DiedBishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Tilkian
Bishop Pierre Tilkian (born , died ) Bishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngora

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 308, and Page 471
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017