Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Marmarian

Deceased

Bishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1833Born
14 Aug 187744.5AppointedBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
23 Sep 187744.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
1900¹66.8DiedBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Marmarian
Bishop Paolo Marmarian (born , died 1900) Bishop of Trabzon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrebisonda
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, Constantinople

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 562
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,877, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast