Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Joseph Testa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Constantinople, Turkey

Titular Bishop of Phacusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1808Born
20 Mar 188576.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Constantinople, Turkey
20 Mar 188576.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Phacusa
26 Apr 188576.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phacusa
24 Sep 188779.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Constantinople, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Charles Joseph Testa
Bishop Charles Joseph Testa (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Constantinople

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople
Ordained BishopS. Esprit, Constantinople

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 450
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017