Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Rotelli

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to France

Titular Archbishop of Pharsalus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1833Born
20 Dec 185623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia, Italy
15 Jul 187844.9AppointedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
21 Jul 187844.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
22 Dec 188249.4ResignedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
22 Dec 188249.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
26 Jan 188349.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
12 May 188753.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1 Jun 189157.8Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jun 189157.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
15 Sep 189158.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to France

MicroData Summary for Luigi Rotelli (VIAF: 160916200)
Luigi Cardinal Rotelli (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of France

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorciano, Diocese of Perugia, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Apollinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Propaganda Fide chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
  • a cardinal for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1891
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 393, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 32
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast