Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Paolucci

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1833Born
11 Apr 185723.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 187642.2AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
27 Feb 187642.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
15 Jul 187844.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
15 Jul 187844.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Perugia, Italy
27 Feb 188046.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
9 Nov 189258.9DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Paolucci (VIAF: 89313014)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Paolucci (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaltara
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 77, and Page 409
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 448, and Page 593
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017