Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benjamin Evsevides

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus

Note/Previous Titular See: (Nauplia, Orthodox)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1821Born
6 Aug 185130.1Ordained BishopArchbishop
3 Nov 186241.3ResignedArchbishop
3 Nov 186241.3Converted
1895²73.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benjamin Evsevides
Archbishop Benjamin Evsevides (born , died 1895) Archbishop Emeritus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCostantinopoli

  • a bishop for 43.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: CB, 8 Feb 2012
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017