Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément Mikaelian

Deceased

Bishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1820Born
14 Aug 187757.2AppointedBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
23 Sep 187757.3Ordained BishopBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey
1890¹69.6DiedBishop of Marasc (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clément Mikaelian
Bishop Clément Mikaelian (born , died 1890) Bishop of Marasc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarasc
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, Constantinople

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 364
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018