Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Garabed (Carlo) Khadifian (Ghadifian), I.C.P.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1814¹BornTokat
14 Aug 187763.6AppointedBishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (Armenian), Turkey
23 Sep 187763.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (Armenian), Turkey
2 Dec 189076.9ResignedBishop of Sivas {Sebaste} (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Garabed (Carlo) Khadifian (Ghadifian):
Bishop Garabed (Carlo) Khadifian (Ghadifian) I.C.P.B. Bishop of Sivas {Sebaste}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 507
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013