Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Léon Korkoruni

Deceased

Bishop of Melitene (Malatia) (Armenian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1822Born
15 Nov 186038.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Melitene (Malatia) (Armenian), Syria
7 Apr 186138.7Ordained BishopBishop of Melitene (Malatia) (Armenian), Syria
15 Aug 189775.1DiedBishop of Melitene (Malatia) (Armenian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Léon Korkoruni
Archbishop Léon Korkoruni (born , died ) Bishop of Melitene (Malatia)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerkinik
Ordained BishopAssumption, Mont Liban

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 378
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017