Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Bahtiarian

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1800BornAncira
14 Sep 182424.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 185050.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian), Turkey
2 Jun 185050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian), Turkey
1870²69.9ResignedBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian), Turkey
18 Apr 188585.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Diarbekir (Amida) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Bahtiarian
Archbishop Giacomo Bahtiarian (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Diarbekir (Amida)

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870, Page 147
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1882, Page 303
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016