Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arsenio Avak-Wartan Angiarakian

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tokat {Toqat} (Armenian), Turkey

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1812Born
10 Sep 185845.7AppointedBishop of Tokat {Toqat} (Armenian), Turkey
15 Aug 185946.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tokat {Toqat} (Armenian), Turkey
4 Jul 186552.6ResignedBishop of Tokat {Toqat} (Armenian), Turkey
21 Jul 186552.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
8 Apr 187461.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tokat {Toqat} (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Arsenio Avak-Wartan Angiarakian
Archbishop Arsenio Avak-Wartan Angiarakian (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tokat {Toqat}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 537
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017