Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Atanasio Raffaele Ciarchi

Deceased

Archbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1826Born
14 Sep 184216.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jan 186235.9AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
28 Sep 186236.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Atanasio Raffaele Ciarchi
Archbishop Atanasio Raffaele Ciarchi (born ) Archbishop of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMardin
Ordained BishopMardin

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017