Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ephrem Yousif Abba Mansoor

Archbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq

Patriarchal Administrator of Mossul (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1951 Born
30 Jun 197827.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 201059.0SelectedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
1 Mar 201159.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
16 Apr 201159.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
Sep 2021³70.2AppointedPatriarchal Administrator of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ephrem Yousif Abba Mansoor
Archbishop Ephrem Yousif Abba Mansoor (born ) Archbishop of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQaraqosh
Ordained BishopMost Pure Virgin Mary, Church, Qaraqosh

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Baghdad (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,039
  • sele: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 71
  • aadm: CB, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast